What’s the product of 33 and 21? Pause the video and try to solve it. The traditional way, is to write ’21 under 33′. Then ‘3 times 1 is 3’, ‘3 times 1 is 3’ again! Write a zero here, ‘3 times 2 is 6’ and ‘3 times 2 is 6′. 396. ’33 times 21′ is 693. But this took a lot of time. Want to see a better way? Okay, here goes! 3 times 2 is ’06’, 3 times 1 is ’03’ and we add this product with this one. 6 plus 3 is 09, 693. Took us less than 5 seconds. Don’t worry! By the end of this video you will be very comfortable multiplying two-digit numbers. First digits of both then second digits of both and then the umbrella approach. Product of these two, plus the product of these two. With the same approach, what will be ’43 times 17′? Pause and try. ‘4 times 1 is 04’, ‘3 times 7 is 21’. ‘3 times 1 plus 4 times 7 is 31’. 1, ‘2 plus 1’ is 3 and ‘4 plus 3′ is 7. 731 is the answer. Easy, wasn’t it? But wait, where exactly do we write these numbers? The unit’s digit of these numbers, should be under the second digit from the right of the number on top. Hence, we wrote the 9 under the 0 and the 1 under the 2. If you forget which products to add just think of an umbrella or a mushroom. Product of these 2, plus the product of these 2. Now take a slightly tougher one. ’76 times 97’. Give it a try. It’s easy. Just that the numbers are bigger this time. ‘7 times 9 is 63’ and ‘6 times 7 is 42’. ‘9 times 6 plus 7 times 7′ is ’54 plus 49’, which is ‘103’. We wrote the three under the second digit from right of the number on top. Two, four plus three is seven. Three, six plus one is seven. 7372 is our answer. 63 is the product of the first digits of each number, 42 is the product of the second digits of each number. And 103 is the sum of the product of these two and the product of these two numbers. Here are three examples for you which you should be able to solve it 30 seconds flat. 15 seconds ideally, but I’m giving you 30 assuming it’s your first time. ’31 times 24′, ’62 times 27′, ’38 times 92′. Your time starts now! Let’s solve this quickly. ‘3 times 2 is 06’, ‘1 times 4 is 04’ and ‘2 plus 12 is 14’. 744 is the correct answer. Okay, next. ‘6 times 2 is 12’, ‘2 times 7 is 14’ and ‘4 plus 42 is 46’. 1674 is the answer. The last one. ‘3 times 9 is 27’, ‘8 times 2 is 16′ and ’72 plus 6 is 78’. 6, 1 plus 8 is 9. 7 plus 7 is 14. We write a 4 and carry the 1 over. 1 plus 2 is 3. 38 times 92 is 3496.

i try it my question was 48*19 = then i did the steps the answer was 516

thank u very much for the easiest way

superb

Some of the videos are missing from the list. It is done intentionally? or you need time to prepare and upload.. BTW very good initiative for making these tricks available to public. God Bless….

Thank u so much for sharing your knowledge with us,that exercise was very helpful.

You are simply an angel! Solved the biggest issue of my life. Lol.

thank you so much

2 minute ad no skip?? Really?

Palindrome is better for me

How can be this mental multiplication? :/ The third example has 7 digits to remember… Almost impossible without using pencil and paper in a reasonable amount of time!

thank you soo much for the tricks this is helping me a lot..

Good

thank you so much…… I am glad I found you…

good

solve 12into12

best

really a trick

vvvvvvv gooooooooooooooodddddddd…………

At maths, I'm very dumb. When i learne this i learned how yo solve problems in mg head very fast and so i did this whenever my teacher asked me math questions and i answered it fast. Everyone was was so shocked that i was put into a higher maths class. Thnk you so much!! (im only 10 btw)

ma'am the video is really good. But i have one doubt – how can you 69×45 using the vedic techniques

Where's the 10 th and 11 th video of this series

Awesome trick . keep educating us . tu.

pls anybody tell shortcut to solve 3 digit * 2 digit numbers .

thank you so much.

superb and very useful for a upcoming engineer like me

Thanks for sharing this with us 😃😃

Wonderful trick dude. I am really happy. I am gonna challenge my cousin. Let's see who wins

could u plz solve this 39×21

How can we find the product of decimal no. By this method

Gggggggooooooooooooooooooooooooooddddddd

thank you. if i found you a year ago,

i would have aced my exams

Thanks because I was having my Vedic maths test the and i was having fought in it

it is not easy

I loved the video.I really can't believe how you get such great techniques to find such calculations.It helped me a lot.Thanks!!!!

pretty good

You are indeed a genius

i only got one mistake in the last part 🙂

Great!!

Love from the Philippines

best!

Cool technique, but trying to do it in my head is confusing. I don't see how it is "mental math". Great video though.

Subtraction easy trick pls pls

Thank you so much

Easy method

Very helpful

Thanks a lot

Sir your trick are awesome, pls make video on division short cut

Thank

277816?

Omg wtf! TIME TO BRAG TO MY FRIENDS HOW MUCH BETTER I AM THEN THEM HHAHAHAHAHA

We call it the rainbow multiplication

thanks… bt pls tell me 32421*11 by base method

Ez math

i think the old method is to solve

Helpful😊

this is a very easy trick.

i am in love with don't memorise

wow it work thanks 😉

lo

i needed this 🙂 i love ur vids so much i become next Albert Einstein

Very easy tq

nice video

#crackthemaths

Thanks i am having a quiz in district level tommorow

Nice it helped me

Thank you very much for sharing waiting for more videos of maths 🤤🤤this became so easy after ur explained

Look it takes more time than traditional method

Steps are longer than old method..

Like

Parts 10 and 11 are missing?

It's a wrong protocol

Nice video to learn Vedic maths

now i know why Indians are good at maths

is it just me or 30 secs is definitely not enought to solve that shit with just your mind

The photo like the fuck

It is still takes time but less. compared to traditional way. Thanks

Orsum with a capital "O" lol, really cool and awesome way to calculate 2 digit numbers multiplied by another 2 digit number 😋thanks!

Is this an Indian Channel ?

I'm also from 🇮🇳🇮🇳🇮🇳🇮🇳🇮🇳

thank you for everything!!!

Thank you very much i love it

it was sort of complex but your videos got me full in school

This is wrong

Answer for 50 multiplied by 50

Is coming as 250 instead of 2500

Algebraic equations par video banai

22×14=308

By your method

And

22×14=2,308

By calculator

Pls answer me

It is very helpful for me. Thank you so much… ❤❤❤

I'm numb. Now I'm number

booooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooooo

How about 2 digit x 3 digit ?

Is this for 2 digits only?

é nóis na gringa rapeize kkkkkkkkkkkkkkkkkk

Could you please provide a link for videos for Fast Vedic Mental Math tricks – Multiplication 10, 11 they seem to be missing

Tuff h easy batao

You should also tell the name of this trick

Thank you very much for your awesome math tricks.

Here after I won't memories .

Please send more and more maths tricks.

UMBRELLA

Very useful

I did this by rounding up doing the multiplation instantly, then take away to get down to exact answer. Sometimes that is much faster than verdic with instant answer but sometimes it's slower. Then again I can do traditional method in my head with no pen or paper which saves time.

Hi Parents and subscribers, this might help you too!!! Math Tapper is a simple, yet addicting math arcade game where basic equations scroll down the screen, presenting two possible answers. Hope this helps.😎 Apple Store – @t

Google Play Link – @t

Thx alot are you a teacher?????

ThanQ for promoting vedic maths. 🙏 💪 🇮🇳 💪

I can do the traditional one in less time

can we use it in exam

please reply

is it okay to skip 10 and 11 ? part of the video? after 9 i found 12 :3 welp!

Vedic mathematics have more simple formula than this one.

That is urdhwatriyakbhyam